12. Md. Mazharul Huqe (02/09/2009 - 15/09/2014)
13. Md. Dauyan nurul huda (15/09/2014 - 18/12/2014)
14. Md. Mazharul Huqe (18/12/2014 - 17/01/2017)
15. Md. Jakir Hushan Sorkar (17/01/2017 - 16/06/2019)
16. Md. Alamgir Hushan (17/06/2019 - 13/03/2022)
17. Md. Muhammad Monirul Huqe Faruke Reza (13/03/2022 - 21/04/2022)
18. Muhammad Shahidullah (21/04/2022 ...................
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS